Global Patent Index - EP 0882649 B1

EP 0882649 B1 2000-05-24 - Method of connecting a packaging container body with a cover member

Title (en)

Method of connecting a packaging container body with a cover member

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbinden eines Unterteils eines Verpackungsbehälters mit einem Verschlusselement

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assemblage d'un corps de récipient et d'un couvercle

Publication

EP 0882649 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98202363 A

Priority

  • DE 19618310 A
  • EP 97106215 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806345A1] The closure component (4) is first positioned with a ring seal (15) on the container edge area (5). Then an axial pressure force (19) is applied on the closure area, using a pressure tool until an adequate sealing compression of the ring seal is achieved. An expanding tool is then brought into contact with a radial inner side (21) of the closure edge area an expansion tool is brought into contact. The two edge areas are expanded by the expansion tool until a firm locking is achieved. In a further step, a free end area (10) of the container edge and a free end area (13) of the closure edge are radially expanded into a cavity (16) of a safety ring (17). The ratio between the container nominal diameter and the effective axial length of the expansion tool is between 15 and 25.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 7/28; B21D 51/34; B65D 8/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/26 (2006.01); B21D 51/34 (2006.01); B65B 7/28 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 45/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/2661 (2013.01); B21D 51/34 (2013.01); B65B 7/2857 (2013.01); B65D 7/36 (2013.01); B65D 43/0229 (2013.01); B65D 43/0295 (2013.01); B65D 45/32 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0038 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00416 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00546 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00972 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806345 A1 19971112; EP 0806345 B1 19990728; AT 182539 T 19990815; AT 193254 T 20000615; AT 197782 T 20001215; DE 19618310 A1 19971120; DK 0806345 T3 19991129; DK 0882649 T3 20000828; EP 0882649 A1 19981209; EP 0882649 B1 20000524; EP 0882650 A1 19981209; EP 0882650 B1 20001129; ES 2134043 T3 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701758

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701758

- Representative's name: RAINER CALLIES, DE

2012-10-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701758

- Representative's name: CALLIES, RAINER, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BMW-VOGEL AG

- Free text: BMW-VOGEL AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 37#4147 AESCH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BMW-VOGEL AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 37#4147 AESCH (CH)

2005-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2002-02-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010416

2001-12-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2001-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BMW-VOGEL A.G.

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010416

2001-04-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010416

2001-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010416

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-08-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701758 20000629

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 806345

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193254 T 20000615

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991001

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981005

1998-12-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 806345

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL