Global patent index - EP 0882650 B1

EP 0882650 B1 2000-11-29 - Method of connecting a packaging container body with a cover member

Title (en)

Method of connecting a packaging container body with a cover member

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbinden eines Unterteils eines Verpackungsbehälters mit einem Verschlusselement

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assemblage d'un corps de récipient et d'un couvercle

Publication

EP 0882650 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98202364 A

Priority

  • DE 19618310 A
  • EP 97106215 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806345A1] The closure component (4) is first positioned with a ring seal (15) on the container edge area (5). Then an axial pressure force (19) is applied on the closure area, using a pressure tool until an adequate sealing compression of the ring seal is achieved. An expanding tool is then brought into contact with a radial inner side (21) of the closure edge area an expansion tool is brought into contact. The two edge areas are expanded by the expansion tool until a firm locking is achieved. In a further step, a free end area (10) of the container edge and a free end area (13) of the closure edge are radially expanded into a cavity (16) of a safety ring (17). The ratio between the container nominal diameter and the effective axial length of the expansion tool is between 15 and 25.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 7/28; B21D 51/34; B65D 8/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/26 (2006.01); B21D 51/34 (2006.01); B65B 7/28 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 45/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/2661 (2013.01); B21D 51/34 (2013.01); B65B 7/2857 (2013.01); B65D 7/36 (2013.01); B65D 43/0229 (2013.01); B65D 43/0295 (2013.01); B65D 45/32 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0038 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00416 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00546 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00972 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806345 A1 19971112; EP 0806345 B1 19990728; AT 182539 T 19990815; AT 193254 T 20000615; AT 197782 T 20001215; DE 19618310 A1 19971120; DK 0806345 T3 19991129; DK 0882649 T3 20000828; EP 0882649 A1 19981209; EP 0882649 B1 20000524; EP 0882650 A1 19981209; EP 0882650 B1 20001129; ES 2134043 T3 19990916

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59702685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-10-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RAINER CALLIES, DE

2012-10-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59702685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CALLIES, RAINER, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BMW-VOGEL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BMW-VOGEL A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-04-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010416

2001-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-04

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-11-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 806345

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197782

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981005

1998-12-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 806345

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI NL