Global Patent Index - EP 0882667 B1

EP 0882667 B1 2001-12-05 - Securing an end flange to a cardboard core

Title (en)

Securing an end flange to a cardboard core

Title (de)

Verbindung eines Endteils mit einem Karton-Rohrkern

Title (fr)

Fixation d'un flasque sur un coeur en carton

Publication

EP 0882667 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810466 A

Priority

DE 19723076 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2239236A1] A tube-shaped stub (5) of the end piece (2) is inserted into the core (1). The s tub (5) has, adjacent to the free end, hook-like projections (11). This achieves secure anchoring of the end piece (2) in the core (1), even under changing climatic con ditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/14; B65H 75/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 33/00 (2006.01); B65H 75/08 (2006.01); B65H 75/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 33/00 (2013.01); B65H 75/08 (2013.01); B65H 75/30 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41369 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723076 A1 19981203; DE 19723076 C2 20000120; AT 210066 T 20011215; CA 2239236 A1 19981202; EP 0882667 A1 19981209; EP 0882667 B1 20011205; US 5997195 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130520

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802294

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130520

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-30 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59802294

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG, EGG, CH

- Document: DE 59802294

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802294

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110520

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110520

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210066 T

- Effective date: 20110520

2012-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802294

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2011-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG

- Free text: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG#LEESTRASSE 1#8132 EGG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG#HALDENSTRASSE 30#8620 WETZIKON (CH)

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100529

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802294 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210066 T 20011215

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PELIKAN HARDCOPY PRODUCTION AG

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990412

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI