Global Patent Index - EP 0882829 B1

EP 0882829 B1 2001-12-19 - Apparatus for the spreading of an end portion of a tubular article

Title (en)

Apparatus for the spreading of an end portion of a tubular article

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spreizen des Endbereiches eines schlauchförmigen Gegenstands

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'écartement d'une extrémité d'un produit manufacturé tubulaire

Publication

EP 0882829 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98830302 A

Priority

IT FI970135 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882829A1] The apparatus is used to open or space the elastic end of a tubular product, e.g. a stocking or stocking tights. It has a tubular body (T) with an entry (1) for the elastic end of the stocking and a programmed air suction sequence. There is a converging channel (2) downstream of the entry. At a set gap downstream from it is a splint (3) where the elastic end of the stockings is spontaneously opened out by the suction action after moving out of the converging channel into an expansion zone (20). The tubular body (T) is made in two parts, along a central longitudinal plane (X-X) to take a stocking with elastic in a relaxed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/00 (2006.01); D05B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 23/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882829 A1 19981209; EP 0882829 B1 20011219; DE 69803006 D1 20020131; DE 69803006 T2 20020814; IT 1293116 B1 19990211; IT FI970135 A1 19981202; IT FI970135 D0 19970602; JP H10331064 A 19981215

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160518

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-01-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803006 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990402

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI