Global Patent Index - EP 0882837 B1

EP 0882837 B1 2002-09-18 - Press blanket

Title (en)

Press blanket

Title (de)

Pressmantel

Title (fr)

Courroie de pressage

Publication

EP 0882837 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107091 A

Priority

DE 19723211 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882837A2] To produce the press mantle of a flexible material, for a press roller, the grooves (1) are distributed over the mantle surface (2) according to the distribution of the reinforcement filaments (4) in the peripheral direction (6) round the mantle (2). The grooves (1) are positioned so that they, and the filaments (4), are not radially over each other in sections and that they run in the same direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0227 (2013.01); D21F 3/0236 (2013.01); Y10S 162/901 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1023 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24537 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2457 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24587 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882837 A2 19981209; EP 0882837 A3 19990210; EP 0882837 B1 20020918; DE 19723211 A1 19981210; JP 4250221 B2 20090408; JP H10331089 A 19981215; US 6149771 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59805574

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805574 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-03-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRESS BLANKET

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010829

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

1999-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI