Global patent index - EP 0882839 A3

EP 0882839 A3 2000-01-19 - Apparatus and method for the application of a liquid or pasty fluid to a moving web

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for the application of a liquid or pasty fluid to a moving web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Mediums auf eine bewegende Bahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour appliquer un matériau liquide ou pâteux sur une bande en mouvement

Publication

EP 0882839 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101872 A

Priority

DE 19723458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882839A2] The apparatus to apply a coating (M) to a moving material (U) has a feed (18) in front of the build-up chamber entry limit unit (22), in the direction (L) of (U) web travel. Also claimed is a coating application operation where the required coating is adjusted by setting the build-up chamber entry limit unit (22) against the web (U) and/or the vol. of the build-up chamber (16) and/or the shape of the build-up chamber (16) and/or the feed rate of the coating medium (M). A number of coating sections of the web (U) are set and adjusted independently of each other across the web width, next to each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/08; D21H 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/26 (2006.01); B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/02 (2006.01); B05D 1/40 (2006.01); D21H 23/32 (2006.01); D21H 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/32 (2013.01); B05C 11/025 (2013.01); D21H 25/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882839 A2 19981209; EP 0882839 A3 20000119; EP 0882839 B1 20021127; DE 19723458 A1 19981210; JP H115054 A 19990112; US 6468588 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050204

2004-09-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-02-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-03-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-02-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030224

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-02-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030224

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59806400

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030109

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: APPARATUS FOR THE APPLICATION OF A LIQUID OR PASTY FLUID TO A MOVING WEB

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FI IT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 6D 21H 25/08 A, 6D 21H 23/32 B

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE