Global Patent Index - EP 0882841 B1

EP 0882841 B1 2002-09-18 - Shoulder cleaner

Title (en)

Shoulder cleaner

Title (de)

Bankettreiniger

Title (fr)

Nettoyeur d'accotement

Publication

EP 0882841 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98109334 A

Priority

CH 129897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882841A1] The method cleans the ballast between permanent way railway lines involves a scoop (3.5) which scoops up the loose ballast temporarily, while the underlying ground is cleaned by at least one cleaning unit. The loose ballast is then returned to the permanent way. Before cleaning, the underlying ground is roughened. The returned loose ballast is returned in separate flow streams through the cleaning unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/10; E01H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/10 (2006.01); E01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/102 (2013.01); E01H 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882841 A1 19981209; EP 0882841 B1 20020918; AT 224478 T 20021015; CH 692205 A5 20020315; DE 59805575 D1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110522

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224478 T

- Effective date: 20110522

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805575

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805575

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805575 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224478 T 20021015

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT NL

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990520

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI