Global Patent Index - EP 0882842 A3

EP 0882842 A3 2000-03-01 - Improved motor sweeper

Title (en)

Improved motor sweeper

Title (de)

Motorangetriebene Kehrvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Balayeuse entraînée par un moteur

Publication

EP 0882842 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98109300 A

Priority

IT MI970395 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882842A2] An improved roadsweeper (1) comprises: a body (3), a driver's seat (7,9) on the body (3), a container (11) which may be moved from a dirt collecting position to a dirt dumping position by means of activating mechanisms (12, 13) located between the body (3) and the container (11). Said roadsweeper has a device (15) for protecting the operator from the dirt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/00 (2006.01); E01H 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/047 (2013.01); E01H 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882842 A2 19981209; EP 0882842 A3 20000301; IT 237539 Y1 20000913; IT MI970395 U1 19981202; IT MI970395 V0 19970602

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020208

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR IT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-25 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: GANSOW ELEKTROBAU GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI