Global patent index - EP 0882863 A3

EP 0882863 A3 2000-01-05 - Check device

Title (en)

Check device

Title (de)

Ausstellvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif déflecteur

Publication

EP 0882863 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107692 A

Priority

DE 29709530 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882863A2] One, or more extension arms (1) hinge on parallel axes (3) on the frame and the leaf of the door or window. One of the arm bearings is on a slide travelling (9) in the direction of the plane (19) of the leaf or frame along a guide bar (8), while a transverse protrusion (11) on the slide (2) engages behind the bar. The bar contains a continuous recess (10) running in the direction of the plane of the frame or leaf. The transverse dimension of the recess matches that of the protrusion, which is accommodated in the recess during installation of the arm, when the latter is in a position different from its working positions. A stop can be provided on the leaf or frame limiting the opening movement of the slide, which tilts on an eccentric axis in relation to the arm and works between two bars spaced apart, each of which contains a recess.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/24; E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/24 (2006.01); E05D 15/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/30 (2013.01); E05C 17/24 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29709530 U1 19970731; AT 259927 T 20040315; EP 0882863 A2 19981209; EP 0882863 A3 20000105; EP 0882863 B1 20040218

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810775

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020405

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI