Global Patent Index - EP 0882865 A3

EP 0882865 A3 2000-04-05 - Lift-off door hinge for vehicles.

Title (en)

Lift-off door hinge for vehicles.

Title (de)

Aushängbares Kraftwagentürscharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière pour porte de véhicule dégondable

Publication

EP 0882865 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109402 A

Priority

DE 19723401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723401C1] The first hinge-half (1) is fixed to a door-fitting, door or door-frame and has a gudgeon (4). The second hinge-half (3) is fixed to another door fitting, and has a gudgeon (5). A hinge-pin (2) fits into the gudgeons of the two hinge-halves to join them. Part of the pin length rotates freely in the gudgeon of one hinge-half and is axially secured and has a flange (7) gripping over the end surface of the gudgeon. The hinge pin and gudgeon of the hinge-half have conical aligning surfaces (13) sloping towards the hinge axis. The end surface and the pin conical aligning surface are formed on a part connectable to the hinge-pin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/12; E05D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/10 (2006.01); E05D 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/121 (2013.01); E05D 7/1044 (2013.01); E05D 2005/122 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 29704055 U1 19970507 - SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723401 C1 19980709; BR 9801769 A 19990706; CN 1088788 C 20020807; CN 1206775 A 19990203; CZ 9801726 A3 19981216; EP 0882865 A2 19981209; EP 0882865 A3 20000405; EP 0882865 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ED. SCHARWAECHTER GMBH, 42855 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 59805576

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805576

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805576 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05D 5/12 A, 7E 05D 7/10 B, 7F 16B 37/00 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980523

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI