Global patent index - EP 0882887 A3

EP 0882887 A3 2000-01-19 - Apparatus and method for controlling internal combustion engine during testing of hybrid vehicle

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for controlling internal combustion engine during testing of hybrid vehicle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine während der Prüfung eines Hybridfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Appareil et méthode pour la régulation d'un moteur à combustion interne pendant l'essai d'un véhicule hybride

Publication

EP 0882887 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98110229 A

Priority

JP 16513197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882887A2] In a hybrid vehicle with an internal combustion engine and a motor mounted thereon, operation of the internal combustion engine stops when a battery has a large remaining charge, so that inspection of the internal combustion engine can not be carried out under such conditions. The present invention controls the internal combustion engine to drive in an inspection mode that is different from a normal driving state at the time of inspection of the internal combustion engine. A control unit mounted to control operation of the internal combustion engine and the motor carries out an inspection control routine in the following manner. The inspection of the internal combustion engine is carried out while a terminal T of a diagnosis connector is connected with a terminal E. The control procedure thus keeps the internal combustion engine driving irrespective of the remaining charge of the battery while the terminals T and E are connected with each other. Inspection of exhaust is carried out while the connection of the terminal T with the terminal E is released. The control procedure accordingly keeps the internal combustion engine driving irrespective of the remaining charge of the battery until a predetermined time period has elapsed since the release of the connection. The structure of the present invention prevents the operation of the internal combustion engine from being stopped at the time of inspection and enable the inspection of the internal combustion engine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 17/02; B60K 6/04; G01M 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01M 17/007 (2006.01); B60K 6/20 (2007.10); B60K 6/442 (2007.10); B60L 11/02 (2006.01); B60W 10/06 (2006.01); B60W 10/26 (2006.01); B60W 20/00 (2006.01); F02D 29/02 (2006.01); F02D 29/06 (2006.01); F02P 17/02 (2006.01); G01M 15/00 (2006.01); G01M 15/04 (2006.01); G01M 15/06 (2006.01); G01M 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60W 10/06 (2013.01); B60K 6/445 (2013.01); B60K 6/448 (2013.01); B60K 6/46 (2013.01); B60W 10/26 (2013.01); F02P 17/02 (2013.01); B60W 2540/10 (2013.01); Y02T 10/48 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6217 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6239 (2013.01); Y02T 10/6243 (2013.01); Y10S 903/903 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5492189 A 19960220 - KRIEGLER WOLFGANG [AT], et al
  • [PA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882887 A2 19981209; EP 0882887 A3 20000119; EP 0882887 B1 20010228; DE 69800542 D1 20010405; DE 69800542 T2 20010809; JP 2982746 B2 19991129; JP H10339183 A 19981222; US 6131538 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-05-23 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69800542

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-04-17 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20130326

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800542

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KANAI, HIROSHI

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02P 17/02 A, 7B 60K 6/04 B, 7G 01M 15/00 B

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980604

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI