Global Patent Index - EP 0882931 B1

EP 0882931 B1 2003-06-04 - Method and device for the combustion of wood pellets or other free-flowing solid fuels

Title (en)

Method and device for the combustion of wood pellets or other free-flowing solid fuels

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbrennung von Holzpellets oder anderer rieselfähiger fester Brennstoffe

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la combustion de boulettes de bois ou de combustibles solides s'écoulant librement

Publication

EP 0882931 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98109055 A

Priority

DE 19723107 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882931A2] The method involves feeding fuel (13) into a collector (12) by means of a conveyor (14,15). The collector divides the combustion chamber into a pre-combustion chamber (11.1) and an after-combustion chamber (11.2). The collector has at least one opening or slot (16). The exhaust gases are drawn off to the side below and or above the collector. Combustion air is supplied below the collector. Water fed into a central heating system is heated with the exhaust gases and radiation heat. An exhaust gas duct (21) with fan leads through the after-combustion chamber. An ash-pan (12) is in or under the slit or opening

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23B 7/00; F23B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23B 1/38 (2013.01); F23B 7/005 (2013.01); F23B 30/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882931 A2 19981209; EP 0882931 A3 19990901; EP 0882931 B1 20030604; AT 242455 T 20030615; DE 19723107 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808580

2015-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808580

- Representative's name: KOHLER SCHMID MOEBUS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCH, DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242455 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808580 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-05-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI NL SE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL SE

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI