Global patent index - EP 0882939 A4

EP 0882939 A4 2000-01-19 - HEATING TUBE FOR ABSORBER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME

Title (en)

HEATING TUBE FOR ABSORBER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME

Title (de)

HEIZROHR FÜR ABSORBER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

TUBE CHAUFFANT POUR ABSORBEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 0882939 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97947889 A

Priority

  • JP 9704554 W
  • JP 33331996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882939A1] The present invention provides a heat exchanger tube for an absorber, which has a degree of improvement of heat exchangeability matching the degree of increase of the heating surface area thereof, and whose mass per unit length is as small as that of a smooth surface tube so as not to increase the material cost. The heat exchanger tube 2 has a structure such that a plurality of raised portions 4 each having an arcuately curved shape in a circumferential direction of the tube, are disposed on an outer circumferential tube so as to extend in an axial direction of the tube, and are arranged in the circumferential direction of the tube such that recessed portions 6 are formed between adjacent ones of the plurality of raised portions 4, and an inner circumferential surface of the tube is corrugated corresponding to the raised and recessed portions 4, 6. Absorbent is dripped spread on the outer circumferential surface of the tube, while a cooling fluid flows through an inside of the heat exchanger tube so as to cool the absorbent on the outer circumferential surface of the tube. A plurality of circumferential groove portions 8 are formed on each of the raised portions 4 at an interval in the axial direction of the tube, each of which circumferential groove portions 8 extending in the circumferential direction of the tube and has a curbed shape at a bottom portion thereof in cross section in the axial and circumferential directions of the tube, so that local portions of the raised portions 4 which are interposed between adjacent ones of the circumferential groove portions 8 constitute mutually independent fins 10, respectively. Opposite end portions of each of the circumferential groove portions 8 in the circumferential direction of the tube have a width which gradually decreases toward the ends, such that the width is zero at the ends. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 37/00; B21D 53/06; F28F 1/06; F28F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/20 (2006.01); B21D 15/00 (2006.01); F25B 37/00 (2006.01); F28D 3/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/06 (2006.01); F28F 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 15/00 (2013.01); B21C 37/20 (2013.01); F25B 37/00 (2013.01); F28D 3/02 (2013.01); F28F 1/06 (2013.01); F28F 1/42 (2013.01); F28F 1/422 (2013.01); F28F 1/426 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9826239A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882939 A1 19981209; EP 0882939 A4 20000119; EP 0882939 B1 20030709; CN 1128331 C 20031119; CN 1211312 A 19990317; JP 3769338 B2 20060426; JP H10176893 A 19980630; WO 9826239 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091210

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): IT

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980813

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): IT