Global Patent Index - EP 0883155 B1

EP 0883155 B1 2002-11-06 - Colour picture tube

Title (en)

Colour picture tube

Title (de)

Farbbildröhre

Title (fr)

Tube image couleur

Publication

EP 0883155 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98304353 A

Priority

JP 14653297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0883155A1] In a colour picture tube (1,2,3) having a phosphor screen (5) composed of a blue-emitting phosphor, a green-emitting phosphor, and a red-emitting phosphor, the ratio A/B of the brightness A of the red-emitting phosphor to the brightness B of the blue-emitting phosphor is 1.40 or more. Thus, red colour purity is improved without a decrease of the brightness of the phosphor screen. Consequently, a colour picture tube with a wide color reproducible region can be provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/20; H01J 29/18; H01J 29/30; H01J 29/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/20 (2006.01); H01J 29/18 (2006.01); H01J 29/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/322 (2013.01); H01J 29/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0883155 A1 19981209; EP 0883155 B1 20021106; CN 1104024 C 20030326; CN 1201248 A 19981209; DE 69809127 D1 20021212; DE 69809127 T2 20031009; JP H10334823 A 19981218; KR 100271709 B1 20001115; MY 120987 A 20051230; TW 388911 B 20000501

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809127 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001212

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980629

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI