Global Patent Index - EP 0883422 A4

EP 0883422 A4 2000-05-10 - IONOMERIC COMPOSITION FOR GOLF BALLS

Title (en)

IONOMERIC COMPOSITION FOR GOLF BALLS

Title (de)

IONOMERE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GOLFBÄLLE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION IONOMERE POUR BALLES DE GOLF

Publication

EP 0883422 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97907784 A

Priority

  • JP 3370496 A
  • US 9702791 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730764A1] A melt blend of a polyester or polyamide elastomer and an ionomer wherein the neutralizing cation is a multi-valent metal, the ionomer being modified with an aminoalkyl group containing alicyclic or aromatic compound, and uses thereof, particularly in golf ball covers and cores.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 37/12; C08L 23/08; C08L 67/00; C08L 77/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 37/00 (2006.01); C08L 23/08 (2006.01); C08L 23/26 (2006.01); C08L 67/00 (2006.01); C08L 67/02 (2006.01); C08L 77/00 (2006.01); A63B 37/02 (2006.01); A63B 37/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 23/08 (2013.01); A63B 37/0024 (2013.01); A63B 37/0031 (2013.01); A63B 37/0036 (2013.01); A63B 37/0084 (2013.01); A63B 37/0094 (2013.01); C08L 67/025 (2013.01); C08L 77/00 (2013.01); A63B 37/0003 (2013.01); A63B 37/0051 (2013.01); A63B 37/0062 (2013.01); A63B 37/02 (2013.01); A63B 37/12 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 23/08 + C08L 2666/20
  2. C08L 23/08 + C08L 2666/18
  3. C08L 67/025 + C08L 23/00
  4. C08L 77/00 + C08L 23/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730764 A1 19970828; AU 1969297 A 19970910; EP 0883422 A1 19981216; EP 0883422 A4 20000510; JP 3606670 B2 20050105; JP H09227737 A 19970902; NZ 330773 A 20000228

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060620

2006-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GOLF BALLS

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040218

2000-05-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT