Global Patent Index - EP 0883467 A4

EP 0883467 A4 2000-05-31 - SUBSTRATE TRANSPORT APPARATUS WITH DOUBLE SUBSTRATE HOLDERS

Title (en)

SUBSTRATE TRANSPORT APPARATUS WITH DOUBLE SUBSTRATE HOLDERS

Title (de)

SUBSTRATTRANSPORTEINRICHTUNG MIT ZWEI SUBSTATHALTER

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT DE SUBSTRAT AVEC DOUBLE PORTE-SUBSTRAT

Publication

EP 0883467 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97902015 A

Priority

  • US 9700533 W
  • US 58708796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9726117A1] A substrate processing apparatus (230) having a supply of substrates (234, 235), a substrate transport module (232), and a substrate processing module (236). The transport module (232) has a movable arm assembly and two substrate holders (200a, 200b) mounted to the movable art assembly. The substrate holders (200a, 200b) each have two separate holding areas for simultaneously holding two substrates. The movable arm assembly has two pairs of driven arms (248, 249, 250, 251). Each pair of driven arms (248, 249, 250, 251) is connected to a separate one of the holders (200a, 200b) for extending and retracting the holders (200a, 200b) along a radial path relative to a center of the movable arm assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25J 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25J 9/06 (2006.01); B25J 9/10 (2006.01); B25J 18/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/677 (2006.01); H01L 21/687 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/67781 (2013.01); B25J 9/107 (2013.01); H01L 21/68707 (2013.01); Y10S 414/135 (2013.01); Y10S 414/137 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9726117A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9726117 A1 19970724; AU 1578397 A 19970811; EP 0883467 A1 19981216; EP 0883467 A4 20000531; JP 2000503478 A 20000321; JP 4084417 B2 20080430; US 6158941 A 20001212; US 6299404 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25J 9/10 A

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980714

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL