Global Patent Index - EP 0883499 B1

EP 0883499 B1 2000-06-28 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A STAMPING FOIL

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING A STAMPING FOIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PRÄGEFOLIE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D' UNE FEUILLE D' ESTAMPAGE

Publication

EP 0883499 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97917228 A

Priority

  • DE 9700298 W
  • DE 19607015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730855A1] The invention concerns a blocking foil, in particular a hot blocking foil, whose special feature is that the decorative layer on the carrier film is provided only in given regions, namely according to a desired pattern of the substrate on the carrier film. According to the invention, in order to produce a blocking foil of this type, the negative regions of the decorative layer which should not remain on the carrier film are removed from the blocking foil carrier film by a receiver foil. The principle advantage of the method is that the design of the decorative layer can be changed rapidly and easily, for example for individually marking substrates.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 1/17; B41M 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/025 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B44C 1/16 (2006.01); B44C 1/165 (2006.01); B44C 1/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/38207 (2013.01); B41M 5/38214 (2013.01); B44C 1/1729 (2013.01); Y10S 428/914 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730855 A1 19970828; AT 194104 T 20000715; AU 2565597 A 19970910; EP 0883499 A1 19981216; EP 0883499 B1 20000628; ES 2148960 T3 20001016; JP 2000506791 A 20000606; MY 115527 A 20030731; US 6059914 A 20000509; ZA 9701164 B 19970825

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701935

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148960 T3

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701935 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194104 T 20000715

1999-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF PRODUCING A STAMPING FOIL

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990614

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980731

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT