Global Patent Index - EP 0883549 B1

EP 0883549 B1 2000-04-05 - LABELLING APPARATUS

Title (en)

LABELLING APPARATUS

Title (de)

ETIKETTIERGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL D'ETIQUETAGE

Publication

EP 0883549 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96943054 A

Priority

  • DE 19606199 A
  • EP 9605479 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19606199C1] The invention relates to labelling apparatus for the application of labels to packages and goods, said apparatus having a label dispensing device (1) and an air-blast labelling device (2). The label dispensing device delivers labels (3) individually from a supply (5) to the air-blast labelling device having a low-pressure chamber with a suction plate (16) which has a plurality of openings and draws in the labels delivered by the label dispensing device. Said air-blast labelling device also has a compressed-air source (31) with a compressed-air distributor and an air-blast plate (19) adjacent the suction plate and provided with a plurality of openings, and a compressed-air pulse generator which directs a jet of compressed air of the compressed-air source through the air-blast plate of the compressed-air distributor and through the suction plate towards the label held by the suction plate in order to detach it from the suction plate and to convey it to the package or item. To be able to change the size and shape of labels rapidly and easily, it is proposed that the air-blast labelling device comprises a slide member (23) between the suction plate (16) and the air-blast plate (19), which member is displaceably mounted in such a manner that, when in different adjustment positions, it covers or opens variable surface areas of the suction and air-blast plates to allow the passage of air which is drawn in or expelled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/28 (2013.01); Y10T 156/171 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19606199 C1 19970410; AT 191416 T 20000415; DE 59604924 D1 20000511; EP 0883549 A1 19981216; EP 0883549 B1 20000405; ES 2144798 T3 20000616; JP 2000506101 A 20000523; JP 3712740 B2 20051102; US 6024149 A 20000215; WO 9730899 A1 19970828

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151208

2017-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170126

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191416 T

- Effective date: 20151207

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604924

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-08-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-12-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-12-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031207

2002-11-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20021108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144798 T3

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604924 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191416 T 20000415

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990324

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980117

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI NL SE