Global Patent Index - EP 0883565 B1

EP 0883565 B1 2000-07-19 - CONVEYOR AND GATHERING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CONVEYOR AND GATHERING SYSTEM

Title (de)

TRANSPORT- UND SAMMELSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT ET D'ASSEMBLAGE

Publication

EP 0883565 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97906109 A

Priority

  • DE 19606866 A
  • EP 9700852 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730924A1] A modular conveying and gathering system for transporting a material (250) in a conveying direction consists of a plurality of conveying modules (A, B) with end sections at the inlet and discharge sides. Each conveying module (A, B) has a conveyor in the form of an endless belt (100, 110) guided by a front and rear roller (104, 108, 114, 116), a drive (210, 212, 210', 212') to drive the conveyor and a plurality of sliding devices (102) fitted at predetermined intervals on the endless belt. The conveying modules (A, B) are arranged in relation to one another in such a way that an end section of a first conveying module (A) on the inlet side and an end section of a second conveying module (B) on the output side define an overlap region (200) in which a sliding device (102) of the conveying modules (A, B) defining the overlap region (200) engages with a material (250') to be conveyed via a part of the length of the overlap region (200). The sliding device (120) of the rear conveying module (A) in the conveying direction engaging with the material (250') is guided in such a way that it tips away from the conveying direction when it moves downwards on reaching the forward roller (104) of the rearmost conveying module (A) in the conveying direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/043 (2006.01); B65H 5/16 (2006.01); B65H 39/04 (2006.01); B65H 39/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730924 A1 19970828; CA 2246525 A1 19970828; CA 2246525 C 19990706; EP 0883565 A1 19981216; EP 0883565 B1 20000719; ES 2150223 T3 20001116; JP 2997550 B2 20000111; JP H11506091 A 19990602; US 6260690 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110221

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59702057

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110221

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110221

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-09-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BOWE SYSTEC GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-09-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: BOEWE SYSTEC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOEWE SYSTEC GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59702057

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-06-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110519 AND 20110525

2011-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BOEWE SYSTEC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-02-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150223

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702057

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990504

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980730

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE