Global Patent Index - EP 0883708 B1

EP 0883708 B1 2001-03-28 - HAIR-STITCHING MACHINE

Title (en)

HAIR-STITCHING MACHINE

Title (de)

HAARSTECHMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PIQUER DES CHEVEUX

Publication

EP 0883708 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96946325 A

Priority

  • DE 9602517 W
  • DE 19549098 A
  • DE 19600052 A
  • DE 19600333 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9724483A2] To keep material outlay and moving bodies to a minimum, a hair-stitching machine is proposed for the stitching of hair into an artificial hairpiece (toupee) using thin, transparent PVC plastic sheets arranged on top of each other on a rigid positive mould and into which the individual hairs are inserted from above and after all hairs have been inserted they are pressed and fastened by adhesive in further procedural steps, in particular using artificial resin, to the carrier sheet. Said hair-stitching machine comprises a cupboard-shaped housing enclosing the control members for step motors for adjusting the moving members. The stitching needle with a supply of hair is arranged above the said housing upper surface which is in the form of an assembly plate. The positive mould (12a) can be moved into a top and a bottom position and can be tilted; it can also be displaced in steps to be three-dimensional in relation to the stitching needle such that during each stitching the stitching needle above the positive mould (12a) enters the insertion point at right angles to the tangent of the surface of the positive mould (12a). A support device (37a, 37b, 37c) is provided with two support arms (37a, 37b) pivotable above the positive mould (12a), and the stitching needle head (15) which has the hair supply (32, 33) is arranged on one support arm (37a) of said support device, and a scanner (50) for the unstitched hairpiece on the positive mould (12a) is arranged on the other support arm (37b) thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9724483 A2 19970710; WO 9724483 A3 19970814; AT 200116 T 20010415; EP 0883708 A2 19981216; EP 0883708 B1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011228

2002-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-12-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606682 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200116 T 20010415

2000-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000505

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI