Global Patent Index - EP 0883976 B1

EP 0883976 B1 2000-03-29 - X-RAY IMAGE DEVICE

Title (en)

X-RAY IMAGE DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDERZEUGUNG MITTELS RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'IMAGE RADIOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0883976 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97902756 A

Priority

  • NL 9700069 W
  • NL 1002466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9732454A1] X-ray image device of the type in which the X-ray image to be formed is built up with the aid of an elongated X-ray detector which is capable of converting incident X-ray radiation into a light image and which performs during operation a scanning movement in a housing of the device in a direction transverse to the longitudinal direction of the elongated X-ray detector, comprising at least one mirror mounted in the housing of the device which at least partially receives the light image formed by the X-ray detector during operation in every position of the X-ray detector during the scanning movement and reflects it to as least one camera which moves synchronously together with the X-ray detector and which is mounted near one of the ends of the elongated X-ray detector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05G 1/64; H01J 31/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 31/50 (2006.01); H05G 1/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 31/50 (2013.01); H05G 1/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9732454 A1 19970904; CN 1214848 A 19990421; DE 69701565 D1 20000504; DE 69701565 T2 20001102; EP 0883976 A1 19981216; EP 0883976 B1 20000329; NL 1002466 C2 19970828

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2005-02-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050218

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2001-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010901

2001-10-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010218

2001-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010901

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010218

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701565 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981209

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL