Global Patent Index - EP 0884137 A3

EP 0884137 A3 2001-05-09 - Connection piece for releasable connection in a tool

Title (en)

Connection piece for releasable connection in a tool

Title (de)

Kupplungsstück für lösbare Verbindung an Werkzeugen

Title (fr)

Moyens de raccordement pour connection débrayable dans un outil

Publication

EP 0884137 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109971 A

Priority

IT BZ970032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884137A2] The locking pin (2) slides across the axis of the square insert (2c) and is operated by displacing (3c) a pin (3) axially mounted in the square insert. The locking pin moves out (2c) by means of progressive insertion (3c) of the conical end (3a) of the pin into the matching conical seating (2b) in the locking pin whose axis is orthogonal to the seating's axis. The movable pin is axially displaced by a spring (6) or by a mechanism with helical guides (9a). The rotary movement (11a) of the handle (11) is converted into a straight axial movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/00; B25B 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/46 (2006.01); B25B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/461 (2013.01); B25B 23/0035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884137 A2 19981216; EP 0884137 A3 20010509; EP 0884137 B1 20030903; AT 248685 T 20030915; DE 59809453 D1 20031009; IT 1292554 B1 19990208; IT BZ970032 A1 19981211; IT BZ970032 D0 19970611

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59809453

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20160412

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-03-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-12-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031214

2003-12-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809453 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-08-27 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 19980611

- Countries: SI

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI SE

2002-01-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19980611;SI PAYMENT 19980611

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT PAYMENT 19980611;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19980611

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI SE

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI