Global Patent Index - EP 0884259 B1

EP 0884259 B1 2000-03-29 - Feed table

Title (en)

Feed table

Title (de)

Anlegetisch

Title (fr)

Table de marge

Publication

EP 0884259 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110127 A

Priority

DE 19724731 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884259A2] A first suction chamber (2) in the form of a main suction box is connected directly to a further, suction chamber in the form of an auxiliary suction box (9) on the discharge end of the delivery table, by means of a suction connecting pump. The top surfaces of the suction chambers have openings over which circulates a suction belt (7) possessing openings, and with a breather (6) for producing a vacuum in the suction chambers. A suction pipe (10) inside a pipe (5) connected to the main suction box opens into a socket (12) opening towards the breather. The suction pipe has ventilation openings (15) with dispenser (13) with matching ventilation openings (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 11/00; B65H 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 11/005 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01); B65H 2406/322 (2013.01); B65H 2406/3661 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884259 A2 19981216; EP 0884259 A3 19990414; EP 0884259 B1 20000329; AT 191204 T 20000415; DE 19724731 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050604

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800109 20000504

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191204 T 20000415

1999-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

1999-12-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990818

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990317

1999-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI