EP 0884268 A3 19990915 - Lifting device for the transport of products
Title (en)
Lifting device for the transport of products
Title (de)
Haltevorrichtung für den Transport von Fördergut
Title (fr)
Dispositif de levage pour le transport de produits
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19724634 A 19970611
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0884268A2] The holder device has at least one permanent magnet (2) to generate a permanent magnetic field. It also has at least one electric magnet coil (3) to generate a temporary magnetic field and to compensate the permanent magnetic field. The device also has a magnetically conductive housing (4). The permanent magnet (2) is magnetised in the direction of its smallest dimension. The permanent magnet (2) in the magnetisation direction (M) has one pole on a housing (4) forming a magnetic feedback. The other pole is arranged with an air gap relative to the conveyor parts. The housing (4) has in cross section two or more bridges (6) on a base plate (5). At least two magnet coils (3) which can be actuated independently on each other are provided in at least one bridge intermediate space. A permanent magnet (2) is provided in each bridge (6).
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B66C 1/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/02 (2006.01); H01F 7/20 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B66C 1/04 (2013.01 - EP US); H01F 7/0252 (2013.01 - EP US); H01F 7/206 (2013.01 - EP US); H01F 2007/208 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [AD] DE 3423482 C1 19851114 - THYSSEN EDELSTAHLWERKE AG
- [A] DE 2321386 A1 19741114 - KRUPP GMBH
- [A] US 4121865 A 19781024 - LITTWIN SR ROBERT L
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 023 (M - 1541) 14 January 1994 (1994-01-14)
- [A] DATABASE COMPENDEX [online] ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US; PLACE JAMES R: "CERAMIC HOLDING MAGNETS", XP002109098, Database accession no. EIX76040003218 & MACH DES NOV 13 1975, vol. 47, no. 26, 13 November 1975 (1975-11-13), pages 119 - 121
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 19724634 C1 19981210; EP 0884268 A2 19981216; EP 0884268 A3 19990915; US 6288623 B1 20010911
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 19724634 A 19970611; EP 98109827 A 19980529; US 9578398 A 19980611