Global Patent Index - EP 0884396 B1

EP 0884396 B1 2003-06-25 - Method for manufacturing a railway wheel and railway wheel so obtained

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a railway wheel and railway wheel so obtained

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Eisenbahnrades und so hergestelltes Eisenbahnrad

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une roue de chemin de fer en acier et roue de chemin de fer obtenue

Publication

EP 0884396 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401042 A

Priority

FR 9706290 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884396A1] A railway wheel, comprising a rim connected to a hub by a flange which is less thick in the axial direction than the rim, is made of steel containing less than 0.35% carbon and less than 5% in total of alloying elements has an Ms point above 270 degrees C. During manufacture it is tempered and then heated at over 550 degrees C, so that at least the outer surface of the rim has mechanical properties as follows: Rm=860-960 MPa, Rp 0.2 at least 700 MPa, K1c at least 80 MPa per square m. Also claimed is a wheel of this sort, made of steel containing by weight 0.2-0.24% carbon, 0.9-1.1% manganese, 0.9-1.1% silicon, 1-1.2% chromium and 0.2-0.25% molybdenum, the rest being iron and impurities. The wheel has the mechanical properties listed above which are not affected by braking equivalent to 540 degrees C maintained for one hour.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/34; B60B 17/00; C22C 38/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21K 1/28 (2006.01); B60B 17/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/34 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/34 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763601 A1 19981127; FR 2763601 B1 19990625; AT 243772 T 20030715; CZ 298116 B6 20070627; CZ 9801521 A3 19990811; DE 69815758 D1 20030731; DE 69815758 T2 20040429; EP 0884396 A1 19981216; EP 0884396 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150429

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150429

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 243772 T

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815758

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140414

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-09-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815758 P 20030731

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

1999-09-22 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 19990105 AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI * 19990210 AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI * 19990712 AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI * 19990712 AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI * 19990712 AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

1999-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-04-14 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE * 990210 AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI