Global Patent Index - EP 0884408 B1

EP 0884408 B1 2002-09-04 - Procedure and device for detecting impurities and foreign fibres in a fibre band

Title (en)

Procedure and device for detecting impurities and foreign fibres in a fibre band

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von Fremdstoffen und Fremdfasern in einem Faserverbund

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour détecter des impuretés et des fibres étrangères dans une bande de fibres

Publication

EP 0884408 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98109996 A

Priority

CH 140997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884408A1] Foreign materials or fibres are recognised in a fibrous structure (2) by forming it into a sliver (4) and then sensing the foreign material on the sliver surface. Also claimed is the corresponding apparatus comprising a sensor (6) which at least partially encloses the moving sliver (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/22; B65H 63/06; D01H 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/30 (2006.01); B65H 63/06 (2006.01); D01G 31/00 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D01H 13/22 (2006.01); D06H 3/10 (2006.01); G01N 21/89 (2006.01); G01N 21/892 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/22 (2013.01); B65H 63/065 (2013.01); D01H 13/165 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884408 A1 19981216; EP 0884408 B1 20020904; CN 1140800 C 20040303; CN 1206109 A 19990127; DE 59805374 D1 20021010; JP H1114333 A 19990122; US 5926267 A 19990720

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080605

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-08-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060817

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060608

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Free text: ZELLWEGER LUWA AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH) -TRANSFER TO- USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH)

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805374 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010219

1999-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990315

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI