Global Patent Index - EP 0884410 B1

EP 0884410 B1 2001-12-19 - Four-Position open-shed jacquard machine.

Title (en)

Four-Position open-shed jacquard machine.

Title (de)

Vierstellungs-Offenfach-Jacquardmaschine

Title (fr)

Mécanique jacquard à foule ouverte à quatre positions

Publication

EP 0884410 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98201902 A

Priority

BE 9700507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884410A1] Shed forming mechanism for a jacquard machine, comprising two hooks (1), (2) both of which can be held in a bottom and a top position and through upwardly and downwardly movable raising means (13-16) can be taken out of each position into the other position, a selecting device (7-12; 17-20) provided for maintaining or allowing the raising means to change each position of each hook as desired, and a pulley device (21, 22, 26) working together with the hooks (1), (2) provided for bringing warp threads to four different heights (a, b, c, d), whereby the height of the warp threads is changed by a change in the position of each respective hook (1), (2) in proportion to the change of height (29) of the hook, and whereby the difference in height (29) between the top and the bottom position is greater for one hook (2) than for the other hook (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 3/12; D03C 3/06; D03C 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/06 (2006.01); D03C 3/12 (2006.01); D03C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/06 (2013.01); D03C 3/12 (2013.01); D03C 3/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884410 A1 19981216; EP 0884410 B1 20011219; BE 1011210 A3 19990601; DE 69803007 D1 20020131; DE 69803007 T2 20020502; TR 199801085 A2 19981221

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69803007

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120608

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100608

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100608

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803007 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

1999-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981120

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI