Global Patent Index - EP 0884439 B1

EP 0884439 B1 2002-11-13 - External door handle, particularly for motor vehicles

Title (en)

External door handle, particularly for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Aussentürgriff, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Poignée exterieure de porte, notamment pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0884439 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110159 A

Priority

DE 19724572 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724572C1] The grip is attached with two levers (2,2') to supports (6,6') about which it can hinge on pivot points (8,8'), which are in line with one another, about a centreline (9). The two levers are U-shaped while the sides of the 'U' are of unequal lengths The two levers (2,2') are dimensioned so that their radial distances from handle attachment point to pivot point are different. When the vehicle door is closed, the grip lies approximately horizontal while the pivot centreline (9) is inclined upwards towards the rear of the vehicle

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/14 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5248175 A 19930928 - BURNS JAMES A [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724572 C1 19981022; EP 0884439 A1 19981216; EP 0884439 B1 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150604

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150604

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806243

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130604

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806243 20021219

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010215

1999-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990313

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI