Global Patent Index - EP 0884441 A3

EP 0884441 A3 2000-04-05 - Lift-off door hinge for vehicles.

Title (en)

Lift-off door hinge for vehicles.

Title (de)

Aushängbares Kraftwagentürscharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière pour porte de véhicule dégondable

Publication

EP 0884441 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109403 A

Priority

DE 19724202 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724202C1] The hinge halves (1,2) are fixed respectively to the door and door-post, the pin (3) being held in a bearing (4) requiring no maintenance in the eye (6) of the first half so that it can turn freely but not slide, and also turning in the eye (12) of the other half when assembled. A flange (16) on the pin fits between the halves and has a cone face towards the detachable one and fitting in a mating taper bore in the latter. An externally-threaded extension (17) on the pin is shorter than the distance between two cone faces (13,21) in the bore (14) of the second half. The spigot (22) is joined to the cone-portion (19) of a nut (20) working against the cone face (21) in the bore (14), and fits in the annular space (23) between the bore (14) and the extension (17) on the pin. The external diameter of the spigot (22), which is tapped can be the same as the clear width of the cylindrical portion of the bore (14) while its length can be at least one-third of that of the bore.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/12; E05D 7/10; F16B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/10 (2006.01); B60J 5/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05D 3/02 (2006.01); E05D 5/10 (2006.01); E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 5/14 (2006.01); F16B 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/121 (2013.01); E05D 5/16 (2013.01); E05D 7/1044 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53607 (2013.01); Y10T 16/536075 (2013.01); Y10T 16/553 (2013.01); Y10T 16/557 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724202 C1 19980903; AR 014878 A1 20010411; BR 9801776 A 19991005; CN 1095020 C 20021127; CN 1207445 A 19990210; DE 59801110 D1 20010906; EP 0884441 A2 19981216; EP 0884441 A3 20000405; EP 0884441 B1 20010801; ES 2162368 T3 20011216; JP 3046575 B2 20000529; JP H11101048 A 19990413; PT 884441 E 20020130; US 5987703 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59801110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59801110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2005-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020523

2003-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-07-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-01-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011029

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2162368

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-06

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010227

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980523

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI