Global Patent Index - EP 0884444 A3

EP 0884444 A3 2000-04-19 - Entrance door for a room

Title (en)

Entrance door for a room

Title (de)

Eingangstür für ein Lokal

Title (fr)

Porte d'entrée de local

Publication

EP 0884444 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98401376 A

Priority

FR 9707393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884444A2] The door, having an outer surface which is subject to a wide range of temperatures during the year, comprises inner and outer sections (9,10) with panels (15,38), covered by insulating layers (14,37) which are joined together by their facing surfaces (20,37a). The outer edges of the insulating layers' facing surfaces are connected by identical interlocking extrusions (33,34) which allow the panels to move relative to one another in parallel planes. The extrusions are in the form of vanes lying parallel to one another and in virtual contact. At least one of the door's outer surfaces is of metal, e.g. aluminium, while the insulating layers are of a synthetic material, e.g. a polystyrene foam such as 'Styrofoam' (RTM).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/70 (2006.01); E06B 3/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/822 (2013.01); E06B 3/7001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884444 A2 19981216; EP 0884444 A3 20000419; EP 0884444 B1 20040915; AT 276422 T 20041015; DE 69826180 D1 20041021; DE 69826180 T2 20051027; FR 2764326 A1 19981211; FR 2764326 B1 19990730; US 6173534 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070609

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *HUSKY

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-11-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HUSKY S.A.

- Free text: HUSKY S.A.#Z.I. LA SEIGLERIE, B.P. 41#44270 MACHECOUL (FR) -TRANSFER TO- HUSKY S.A.#Z.I. LA SEIGLERIE, B.P. 41#44270 MACHECOUL (FR)

2006-07-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826180 P 20041021

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-01-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI