Global Patent Index - EP 0884460 A3

EP 0884460 A3 2002-11-27 - Exhaust system, suitable for retrofitting exhaust catalysts in motorcycles

Title (en)

Exhaust system, suitable for retrofitting exhaust catalysts in motorcycles

Title (de)

Abgassystem, geeignet für die Nachrüstung von Abgaskatalysatoren bei Motorrädern

Title (fr)

Système d'échappement permettant l' installation ultérieure de catalyseurs d'échappement sur des motocyclettes

Publication

EP 0884460 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110635 A

Priority

DE 19724964 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884460A2] The exhaust gas system (11) has at least one clamping component (5) engaging on at least one of the exhaust gas conduit pieces (4,14), with which the catalyser (12) is clamped between the exhaust gas conduit pieces. The catalyser (12) has a housing (18), which via at least one of the clamping components (5) is clamped to the exhaust gas conduit pieces (4,14). At least one of the clamping components is preferably a spiral spring. At least one such component is connected via a ring with the at least one exhaust gas conduit piece. At least at one face-side end of the catalyser housing (18), the housing and a section of the exhaust gas conduit piece are inserted one in the other along a connecting area extending crossways to the peripheral direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; F01N 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/08 (2010.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1811 (2013.01); F01N 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884460 A2 19981216; EP 0884460 A3 20021127; DE 19724964 A1 19981217; JP H1113463 A 19990119; US 6200538 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI