Global Patent Index - EP 0884533 A3

EP 0884533 A3 2000-04-12 - Gas tap with flame safety device

Title (en)

Gas tap with flame safety device

Title (de)

Gashahn mit einer Flammensicherheitsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Robinet à gaz avec un dispositif de sécurité de flamme

Publication

EP 0884533 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500067 A

Priority

ES 9701650 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884533A2] A gas tap with a safety device for hob units, comprising a housing (2) for the tap, a rotary rod (3) that moves axially to control gas flow, a cover (10) in the base of the tap, forming a sealed chamber (9), a safety valve whose obturator (5) moves at right angles to the rod (3) and a mechanism (11,12) for kinetic transmission from said rod (3) for the operation by means of a rocker of said safety obturator (5), said kinetic transmission mechanism (11,12) has a thrust element (11) which can be moved axially by the rod (3) of the tap, and is free to rotate with the rocker (12), coupled inside the tap by the reciprocal contact of a number of inclined surfaces (19,20) on both. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/107 (2013.01); F23N 2035/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884533 A2 19981216; EP 0884533 A3 20000412; EP 0884533 B1 20030514; DE 69814524 D1 20030618; DE 69814524 T2 20040408; ES 1037562 U 19980316; ES 1037562 Y 19981116; IT 237917 Y1 20000929; IT MI970671 U1 19990319

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140312

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140312

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69814524

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140312

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69814524

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814524 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020213

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI