Global Patent Index - EP 0884536 A3

EP 0884536 A3 2000-05-24 - Control system for a fuel burning appliance

Title (en)

Control system for a fuel burning appliance

Title (de)

Regelsystem für einen Brenner

Title (fr)

Système de commande pour un brûleur

Publication

EP 0884536 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98304558 A

Priority

GB 9712450 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884536A2] A control system 1 for a fuel burning appliance, the control system 1 comprising: ignition means 5 for igniting the fuel with an electrically generated spark; a controller 11 for controlling the ignition means; at least one other system component 9; and means 30 for isolating the at least one other system component at least for the duration of the spark. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 2023/20 (2013.01); F23N 2027/36 (2013.01); F23N 2031/00 (2013.01); F23N 2031/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884536 A2 19981216; EP 0884536 A3 20000524; EP 0884536 B1 20031203; GB 9712450 D0 19970813

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050609

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020422

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI