Global Patent Index - EP 0884546 A3

EP 0884546 A3 2000-02-02 - Installation for the distribution and/or the sluicing of warm fines

Title (en)

Installation for the distribution and/or the sluicing of warm fines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verteilung und/oder Schleusung eines heissen mehlförmigen Gutes

Title (fr)

Installation pour distribuer et/ou servir d'écluse à des matières chaudes en poudre

Publication

EP 0884546 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108587 A

Priority

  • DE 19720951 A
  • DE 19732778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6000937A] A cement plant for the production of cement clinker from cement raw meal has a flat plate shaped control element for distributing and/or transporting-feeding a stream of hot flour-like material which is subjected to severe thermochemical and abrasive ware. the service life of the control element is greatly increased by constructing it as a hollow body (19, 22) through which coolant flows from at least one inlet opening to at least one discharge opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 7/20; F27D 3/10; F27D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 7/2033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6000937 A 19991214; DK 0884546 T3 20021028; EP 0884546 A2 19981216; EP 0884546 A3 20000202; EP 0884546 B1 20020807

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-10-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050411

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030508

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805065

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 27B 7/20 A, 7F 27D 13/00 B, 7F 27D 3/10 B, 7B 04C 5/15 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI