Global Patent Index - EP 0884700 A3

EP 0884700 A3 2000-03-08 - Homing pigeon registration system

Title (en)

Homing pigeon registration system

Title (de)

Brieftaubenkonstatiersystem

Title (fr)

Système d'enregistrement pour pigeons voyageurs

Publication

EP 0884700 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108879 A

Priority

DE 19724559 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884700A2] The system consists of a reader with a timer (12), a data receiver (14), a data memory (16), a display (18), a power transmitter (20), a power source (56) and an antenna coil (22) for contactless data communications with a mobile transponder (26). The transponder is attached to the foot of the carrier pigeon (24) with a data transmitter, a data receiver, a memory and a power receiver. The timer, the display, the data receiver, the power transmitter and the antenna coil of the reader are arranged in a common housing (28). The power source can be an internal or external battery or a mains adapter connectable via cables. The reader can be used in mobile manner for manually registering carrier pigeons or in static manner for recording pigeons at or near the entry opening (48).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884700 A2 19981216; EP 0884700 A3 20000308; EP 0884700 B1 20040616; CN 1087457 C 20020710; CN 1201958 A 19981216; DE 19724559 A1 19981217; PL 186955 B1 20040430; PL 326785 A1 19981221

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090515

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090515

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STOBBE ANATOLI

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811562 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI