Global Patent Index - EP 0884705 A3

EP 0884705 A3 2000-03-15 - Protection device against moisture for motion detector

Title (en)

Protection device against moisture for motion detector

Title (de)

Feuchtigkeitsschutzeinrichtung für Bewegungsmelder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre l'humidité pour détecteur de mouvement

Publication

EP 0884705 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106944 A

Priority

DE 19725080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884705A2] The motion sensor has a plastic housing (1) with a water outlet opening (5) on the lowest lying part of the housing base (4) when in installed state. The water outlet opening is closed off by a porous solid state filter plate (6) with hydrophilic properties. The porous filter plate can be metal, ceramic or plastic. A water outlet edge is formed on the outside of the housing in the vicinity of the water outlet opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0745842 A1 19961204 - STAEFA CONTROL SYSTEM SCS AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884705 A2 19981216; EP 0884705 A3 20000315; DE 19725080 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020612

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FI LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI LI NL SE

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI