Global patent index - EP 0884795 B1

EP 0884795 B1 2000-10-04 - Global positioning system antenna location

Title (en)

Global positioning system antenna location

Title (de)

Stelle einer GPS-Antenne

Title (fr)

Emplacement d'une antenne GPS

Publication

EP 0884795 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97309457 A

Priority

GB 9624772 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884795A1] A vehicle (1) including a GPS antenna(3) , the vehicle (1) including an air intake grill cover (5) including vents through which air is taken into the vehicle and extending across the vehicle between the base of its windscreen (7)and the rear edge of its bonnet (9), in which the GPS antenna is mounted directly beneath the air intake grill cover. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/3233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884795 A1 19981216; EP 0884795 B1 20001004; DE 69703234 D1 20001109; DE 69703234 T2 20010215; GB 9624772 D0 19970115

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011124

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001121

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703234

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-09

2000-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001102

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991029

1999-09-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981127

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI