Global Patent Index - EP 0884810 A3

EP 0884810 A3 2000-01-12 - Carbon brush for electrical machines

Title (en)

Carbon brush for electrical machines

Title (de)

Kohlebürste für eine elektrische Maschine

Title (fr)

Balai en charbon pour machines électriques

Publication

EP 0884810 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98110488 A

Priority

DE 19725082 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884810A2] the carbon brush (1) makes spring contact with a collector (2), whereby the carbon brush is arranged in a guide (3) to be radially movable wrt. the collector and is flexurally stiffly connected to a flexing arm (7). An arm end of the flexing arm at the brush end is radially movable together with the carbon brush and a second arm end is fixed wrt. the carbon brush. The flexing arm engages a carbon brush body (6) with its arm end in a shape locking fit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/38; H01R 39/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/36 (2006.01); H01R 39/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/36 (2013.01); H01R 39/381 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884810 A2 19981216; EP 0884810 A3 20000112; DE 19725082 A1 19990107; US 6011342 A 20000104

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060102

2004-02-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO WISCHERSYSTEME GMBH

2002-11-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO WISCHERSYSTEME GMBH

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO AUTO-ELECTRIC WISCHER UND MOTOREN GMBH

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000205

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 39/38 A, 7H 01R 39/39 B

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI