Global Patent Index - EP 0884902 A3

EP 0884902 A3 2000-10-04 - A multichannel recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (en)

A multichannel recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (de)

Ein Vielkanal-Aufnahme und Wiedergabeanlage

Title (fr)

Un appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction à canaux multiples

Publication

EP 0884902 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98304549 A

Priority

  • JP 15178397 A
  • JP 6278798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0884902A2] A multichannel recording and reproducing apparatus is disclosed which includes: an input and output circuit (103); a buffer (104) for temporally storing multichannel of video data through inputting and outputting circuit; a disc unit (106) for storing the video data; a disc interface (105); a user interface circuit (110) for receiving recording and reproducing commands and a corresponding file name from a user; a control circuit (109) responsive to the user interface (110) for obtaining one of N video channel circuits of the input and output circuit (103) for inputting and outputting video data and receiving recording and reproducing commands; a filing circuit (107) controlling files and determining first and second address data of the disc unit (106) according to the recording and reproducing commands respectively; an access control circuit (108) for accumulating the recording and reproducing commands and supplying each of the accumulated recording and reproducing commands when the disc interface (105) is in a non-operating condition with priority provided to either of the recording or reproducing command according to priority data. The inputting and outputting circuit (103) may include a digital satellite broadcasted video data receiver and a separater for separating the multiplexed digital satellite broadcasted video data into a plurality of sets of digital video data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/915 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); H04N 5/765 (2006.01); H04N 5/92 (2006.01); H04N 5/85 (2006.01); H04N 5/926 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/9205 (2013.01); H04N 5/85 (2013.01); H04N 5/9261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0884902 A2 19981216; EP 0884902 A3 20001004; EP 0884902 B1 20040915; DE 69826182 D1 20041021; DE 69826182 T2 20051020; JP H1169279 A 19990309; US 6278837 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090609

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090609

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69826182

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021112

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980617

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI