Global Patent Index - EP 0884996 A4

EP 0884996 A4 2001-05-30 - SKIN CARE COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

SKIN CARE COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

HAUTPFLEGEMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS POUR SOINS DE LA PEAU

Publication

EP 0884996 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97906668 A

Priority

  • GB 9604674 A
  • US 9702554 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9732560A1] A skin care composition in the form of an oil-in-water emulsion comprising: (a) from about 0.1 % to about 10 % by weight of a particulate component having an average particle size of about 50 microns or less; (b) from about 0.1 % to about 20 % by weight of an organic liquid crystal-forming amphiphilic surfactant; (c) emulsified oil phase; and (d) water. The compositions of the invention provide improved skin feel, reduced greasiness/stickiness and faster absorption.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/00; A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/02 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/06 (2006.01); A61K 8/25 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/81 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/892 (2006.01); A61K 8/895 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C08L 83/04 (2006.01); C08L 83/05 (2006.01); C08L 83/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/895 (2013.01); A61K 8/0241 (2013.01); A61K 8/0295 (2013.01); A61K 8/06 (2013.01); A61K 8/062 (2013.01); A61K 8/25 (2013.01); A61K 8/34 (2013.01); A61K 8/375 (2013.01); A61K 8/4973 (2013.01); A61K 8/60 (2013.01); A61K 8/8111 (2013.01); A61K 8/891 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61K 2800/412 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9732560 A1 19970912; AU 2130197 A 19970922; AU 726435 B2 20001109; CA 2247825 A1 19970912; CN 1108785 C 20030521; CN 1215324 A 19990428; CZ 9802840 A3 19990113; EP 0884996 A1 19981223; EP 0884996 A4 20010530; GB 9604674 D0 19960501; JP 3621112 B2 20050216; JP H11506125 A 19990602

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060527

2006-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/00 20060101AFI20060223BHEP

2006-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 19/00 20060101ALI20060223BHEP

2005-09-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1016481

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040130

2001-05-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/00 A, 7A 61K 7/48 B

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980925

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE