Global Patent Index - EP 0885074 B1

EP 0885074 B1 2000-01-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING STAMPED PARTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING STAMPED PARTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STANZTEILEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DES PIECES DECOUPEES A LA PRESSE

Publication

EP 0885074 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97906163 A

Priority

  • DE 19608551 A
  • EP 9701093 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19608551A1] The invention concerns a method for producing stamped parts, in particular plates, which comprises only two steps. In a first method step, the workpiece is blanked inside a device (1) in a fine blanking stage (2) and, after blanking, is moved to a stamping stage (3) by means of transfer tongs (4) which are likewise housed in the device (1). The stamping stage (3) is also located inside the device (1). In a second method step, the inner and outer contours are stamped on the workpiece (5) in the stamping stage (3) such that the burrs produced on the workpiece (5) during the first step are rounded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/02; B21D 19/00; B21D 35/00; B21D 43/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 19/00 (2006.01); B21D 28/02 (2006.01); B21D 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 19/005 (2013.01); B21D 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19608551 A1 19970911; EP 0885074 A1 19981223; EP 0885074 B1 20000105; ES 2140213 T3 20000216; JP 2000506781 A 20000606; US 6212930 B1 20010410; WO 9732678 A1 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170626

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170304

2017-03-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170304

2017-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-03-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59700973

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FEINTOOL INTERNATIONAL HOLDING AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FEINTOOL INTERNATIONAL HOLDING AG, LYSS, CH

- Document: DE 59700973

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FEINTOOL INTERNATIONAL HOLDING AG, LYSS, CH

- Document: DE 59700973

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59700973

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #88038 FRIEDRICHSHAFEN (DE) $ FEINTOOL INTERNATIONAL HOLDING AG#INDUSTRIERING 8#3250 LYSS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #88038 FRIEDRICHSHAFEN (DE) $ FEINTOOL INTERNATIONAL HOLDING AG#INDUSTRIERING 8#3250 LYSS (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2140213 T3

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59700973 20000210

2000-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000106

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990322

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980711

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI