Global patent index - EP 0885143 A4

EP 0885143 A4 2000-01-19 - PARTS SUPPLYING APPARATUS AND PARTS ARRAY

Title (en)

PARTS SUPPLYING APPARATUS AND PARTS ARRAY

Title (de)

ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR KLEINTEILE, SOWIE EINE REIHE VON AUF EINEM TRÄGER ANGEORDNETEN KLEINTEILEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ASSURANT UNE ALIMENTATION AVEC EN ENSEMBLE DE PIECES ET L'ENSEMBLE DE PIECES EN QUESTION

Publication

EP 0885143 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96926749 A

Priority

  • JP 20781995 A
  • US 9611997 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703884A1] A parts supplying apparatus for supplying an array of resin molded parts (10) includes an elongated guide member (80) having a longitudinally extending guide passage (81) through which the parts array is fed, and a rotatably driven winding device (43). The guide member has a guide surface (83) along which the parts array is guided and is also provided with at least one hole (85) through which the carrier (31, 33) is drawn to allow the carrier to be drawn away and separated from the molded parts. The carrier is adapted to be wound on the winding device for pulling the carrier and effecting movement of the parts array within the guide passage and for causing the carrier to be separated from the molded parts as the molded parts move past the hole in the guide member. A parts array utilized in conjunction with such an apparatus includes a plurality of molded parts and a carrier to which each of the molded parts are arranged in a row on the carrier. The molded parts are attached to the carrier in such a way that the molded parts are separable from the carrier when the carrier is pulled away from the molded parts. The carrier can be in the form of a pair of wires (31, 33) or a tape (131).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 19/00 (2006.01); B65B 69/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/72 (2006.01); B65D 5/74 (2006.01); B65D 73/00 (2006.01); B65D 73/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/748 (2013.01); B65B 69/00 (2013.01); B65D 5/029 (2013.01); B65D 5/727 (2013.01); B65D 73/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703884 A1 19970206; AU 6678596 A 19970218; AU 709787 B2 19990909; CA 2226764 A1 19970206; CN 1096389 C 20021218; CN 1135189 C 20040121; CN 1197434 A 19981028; CN 1343608 A 20020410; DE 69624145 D1 20021107; DE 69624145 T2 20030703; DE 69631915 D1 20040422; DE 69631915 T2 20050203; EP 0885143 A1 19981223; EP 0885143 A4 20000119; EP 0885143 B1 20021002; EP 1090844 A1 20010411; EP 1090844 B1 20040317; JP 3493564 B2 20040203; JP H0929555 A 19970204; KR 100425807 B1 20040630

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080719

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080719

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080719

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69624145

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021107

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7B 65B 69/00 A, 7B 65B 61/18 B

2001-12-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: PARTS SUPPLYING APPARATUS

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE SA

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-01-26 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19991207

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991207

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980209

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT