Global Patent Index - EP 0885150 B1

EP 0885150 B1 2000-04-19 - GROUPING ELEMENT FOR ASSEMBLING PACKAGES CONTAINING POTS ARRANGED IN LAYERS

Title (en)

GROUPING ELEMENT FOR ASSEMBLING PACKAGES CONTAINING POTS ARRANGED IN LAYERS

Title (de)

GRUPPIERUNGSELEMENT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERPACKUNGEN,WELCHE LAGENWEISE ANGEORDNETE BECHER ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE GROUPAGE POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE D'EMBALLAGES CONTENANT DES POTS REUNIS EN PLAQUES

Publication

EP 0885150 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97906230 A

Priority

  • FR 9700313 W
  • FR 9602064 A
  • FR 9608176 A
  • FR 9608209 A
  • FR 9611933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730908A1] A grouping element for grouping at least two packages (12, 14, 16) that each contain at least one layer of pots (18) optionally joined together by a flange (20), said packages being arranged side by side in a single row so that their respective open sides face the same way. The grouping element includes a cardboard bottom wall (26) for supporting the packages, and two side cardboard flaps (28, 30) hinged to two opposite sides of said bottom wall. The end of each flap is provided with at least two tabs (32, 34, 36, 38) that may be folded at right angles to the side flaps and inserted into the two gaps (57, 58) between the pots in the two packages (12, 16) located furthest away, so that they are wedged under the flanges (20) of said pots or under the top walls of said packages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/38 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00141 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00154 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00209 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00666 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00716 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0079 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730908 A1 19970828; DE 69701733 D1 20000525; DE 69701733 T2 20000831; EP 0885150 A1 19981223; EP 0885150 B1 20000419; ES 2147437 T3 20000901

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090220

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090221

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090220

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090221

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090220

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-11-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-11-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090220

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070220

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMURFIT-SOCAR

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147437 T3

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SAMA PATENTS

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701733 20000525

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT LU NL

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990129

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980812

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT LU NL