Global Patent Index - EP 0885205 A4

EP 0885205 A4 2002-11-27 - FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

FIBRINOGEN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

FIBRINOGEN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS DE FIBRINOGENES

Publication

EP 0885205 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97906712 A

Priority

  • GB 9606489 A
  • US 9702712 W
  • US 1238096 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9731910A1] Fibrinogen receptor antagonists of the general formula (I): X-A-Y-Z-B, and which includes, for example, the compounds of formula (IV), are useful for inhibiting the binding of fibrinogen to blood platelets, inhibiting the aggregation of blood platelets, treating thrombus formation or embolus formation, and preventing thrombus or embolus formation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 295/155; C07D 401/04; C07D 401/06; C07D 401/12; C07D 409/12; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/495; A61K 31/505; A61K 31/725; C07D 209/08; C07D 471/04; C07D 211/22; C07D 213/81; C07D 211/34; C07D 213/82; C07D 215/38; C07D 295/12; C07D 295/14; C07D 333/34; C07D 333/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/4353 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4402 (2006.01); A61K 31/4406 (2006.01); A61K 31/4409 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/4465 (2006.01); A61K 31/4523 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/472 (2006.01); A61K 31/4725 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); C07D 209/08 (2006.01); C07D 211/22 (2006.01); C07D 211/34 (2006.01); C07D 213/81 (2006.01); C07D 213/82 (2006.01); C07D 215/227 (2006.01); C07D 215/38 (2006.01); C07D 295/14 (2006.01); C07D 295/155 (2006.01); C07D 333/34 (2006.01); C07D 333/38 (2006.01); C07D 333/40 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 215/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/81 (2013.01); C07D 209/08 (2013.01); C07D 211/22 (2013.01); C07D 211/34 (2013.01); C07D 213/82 (2013.01); C07D 215/227 (2013.01); C07D 295/155 (2013.01); C07D 333/38 (2013.01); C07D 401/04 (2013.01); C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9731910 A1 19970904; AU 2133297 A 19970916; AU 712082 B2 19991028; CA 2246756 A1 19970904; EP 0885205 A1 19981223; EP 0885205 A4 20021127; JP 2000505471 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020903

2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-11-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 295/155 A, 7C 07D 401/04 B, 7C 07D 401/06 B, 7C 07D 401/12 B, 7C 07D 409/12 B, 7A 61K 31/47 B, 7A 61K 31/445 B, 7A 61K 31/495 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B, 7A 61K 31/725 B, 7C 07D 209/08 B, 7C 07D 471/04 B, 7C 07D 211/22 B, 7C 07D 213/81 B, 7C 07D 211/34 B, 7C 07D 213/82 B, 7C 07D 215/38 B, 7C 07D 295/12 B, 7C 07D 295/14 B, 7C 07D 333/34 B, 7C 07D 333/38 B

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE