Global Patent Index - EP 0885289 B1

EP 0885289 B1 2001-05-30 - SOLID DETERGENT PREPARATIONS AND METHOD OF PREPARING THEM

Title (en)

SOLID DETERGENT PREPARATIONS AND METHOD OF PREPARING THEM

Title (de)

FESTE REINIGUNGSMITTELZUBEREITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PREPARATIONS D'AGENTS NETTOYANTS SOLIDES ET PROCEDE POUR LEUR OBTENTION

Publication

EP 0885289 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97902225 A

Priority

  • DE 19603760 A
  • EP 9700340 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19603760A1] Solid detergent preparations are disclosed for use in dish washing machines in the form of pressed pourable grains with a powder density of at least 700g/l; these preparations can be manufactured using little or no water and with a minimum of drying processes. To that end, solid components, including at least some builders, alkali carriers, oxygen bleaches and/or bleach activators, are used, together with other substances at least some of which are liquid or plastically deformable (fluid phase) at temperatures above 30 DEG C. The fluid phase contains at least one additional component which is solid at temperatures below about 30 DEG C and has a melting point of below 60 DEG C. Also disclosed is a process for manufacturing solid detergent preparations, whereby the components in a homogenous mixture are extruded at a temperature above 30 DEG C, cut into the predetermined dimensions and, if necessary, shaped. The additional component of the fluid phase is allowed to set by cooling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/39; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/065 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19603760 A1 19970807; AT 201713 T 20010615; EP 0885289 A1 19981223; EP 0885289 B1 20010530; EP 0885289 B2 20050608; ES 2158487 T3 20010901; ES 2158487 T5 20051201; PT 885289 E 20011130; WO 9728245 A1 19970807

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070125

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020125

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070126

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070125

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070125

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070125

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-03-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-14 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060103

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2005-11-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2005-10-05 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2005-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT

2005-05-04 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SOLID DETERGENT PREPARATIONS AND METHOD OF PREPARING THEM

2004-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2004-08-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20020227

2003-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2002-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

2002-04-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-01-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158487 T3

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703675 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201713 T 20010615

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990531

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980725

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL PT