Global Patent Index - EP 0885312 B1

EP 0885312 B1 2000-01-19 - USE OF SUGAR TENSIDES FOR DEGREASING LEATHERS AND HIDES

Title (en)

USE OF SUGAR TENSIDES FOR DEGREASING LEATHERS AND HIDES

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ZUCKERTENSIDEN ZUM ENTFETTEN VON LEDERN UND PELZEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'AGENTS DE SURFACE A BASE DE SUCRE POUR DEGRAISSER LE CUIR ET LES PEAUX

Publication

EP 0885312 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97907050 A

Priority

  • DE 19609056 A
  • EP 9700972 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19609056A1] The use of (a) alkyl and/or alkenyl oligoglycosides and/or (b) fatty acid-N-alkyl polyhydroxy alkyl amides is proposed for degreasing leathers and hides. The subtances prove at least as effective as current market products and are distinguished by reduced environmental pollution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C14C 5/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 5/00 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609056 A1 19970911; DE 19609056 C2 19990211; AT 189005 T 20000215; EP 0885312 A1 19981223; EP 0885312 B1 20000119; ES 2142146 T3 20000401; PT 885312 E 20000630; WO 9733002 A1 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-12-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20091116

2009-10-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2008-12-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-11-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-02-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-02 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20010202

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142146 T3

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701037 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT PT

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980902

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189005 T 20000215

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990318

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980902

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT PT

1998-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 980902