Global Patent Index - EP 0885333 B1

EP 0885333 B1 2001-05-09 - FACE WALLING IN SANITARY INSTALLATIONS

Title (en)

FACE WALLING IN SANITARY INSTALLATIONS

Title (de)

VORMAUERUNG IM SANITÄRBEREICH

Title (fr)

PAROI DE PROTECTION POUR INSTALLATIONS SANITAIRES

Publication

EP 0885333 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97906140 A

Priority

  • DE 19608005 A
  • EP 9700986 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19608005A1] A support for a boarded panel component (26), especially for machine-fitted face walling in sanitary installations, has a retaining element (10), which has a base plate (12) for securing said retaining element (10) to a building wall (32) and at least one pair of clamping lugs (14) projecting from the base plate (12), for securing a boarded panel component (26). Such supports make it possible to fit boarded panel components (26) proud on a wall so that the insulating space open at the front and defined by said boarded panel components (26) may be filled with mortar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/38; E04C 2/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/01 (2006.01); E04B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/2608 (2013.01); E03C 1/01 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

SCHNEIDER: "Bautabellen", 1986, WERNER VERLAG, 7.AUFLAGE, DÜSSELDORF

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19608005 A1 19970918; AT 201078 T 20010515; EP 0885333 A1 19981223; EP 0885333 B1 20010509; WO 9733050 A1 19970912

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703507 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201078 T 20010515

1999-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARMORIT GMBH

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981229

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980820

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI