Global Patent Index - EP 0885341 B1

EP 0885341 B1 2000-06-21 - APPARATUS FOR SMOKE EVACUATION

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR SMOKE EVACUATION

Title (de)

RAUCHABZUGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EVACUATION DE FUMEE

Publication

EP 0885341 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97906162 A

Priority

  • EP 9701091 W
  • IT VI960029 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9733062A1] The invention realizes an apparatus for smoke evacuation (1) comprising: a basement (2) which defines an opening (3) made in a building; a cover (4) co-operating in opening and closing actions with said basement (2); moving means (6) for the rotation of said cover (4); hooking means (7) suited to block said cover (4) in the closing position; a mechanical lock (8) suited to block said cover (4) in position of maximum opening; a release device (150) which through remote control means, releases said mechanical lock (8), before that said moving means (6) begin the closing of said cover (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/04; E05C 17/14; E05F 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/035 (2006.01); E05C 17/14 (2006.01); E05F 15/00 (2015.01); E05B 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0351 (2013.01); E05C 17/14 (2013.01); E05F 15/53 (2013.01); E05F 15/72 (2013.01); E05B 51/02 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/422 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/448 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/154 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9733062 A1 19970912; AT 194025 T 20000715; CZ 293096 B6 20040218; CZ 9802780 A3 19990217; DE 69702337 D1 20000727; DE 69702337 T2 20010118; EP 0885341 A1 19981223; EP 0885341 B1 20000621; ES 2149574 T3 20001101; GR 3034377 T3 20001229; IT 1287255 B1 19980804; IT VI960029 A1 19970905; IT VI960029 D0 19960305; PL 182530 B1 20020131; PL 328731 A1 19990215; PT 885341 E 20001229; SK 121298 A3 19990211; SK 285154 B6 20060707

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120305

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110304

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090306

2010-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090306

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090305

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090305

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090305

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CAODURO CARLO

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CAODURO PAOLO

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-09-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080305

2009-02-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080303

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149574 T3

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-08-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO ING. E. BONINI S.R.L.

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702337 20000727

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194025 T 20000715

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAODURO, CARLO

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAODURO, PAOLO

1999-09-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAODURO, CARLO

1999-09-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAODURO, PAOLO

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981002

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT