Global Patent Index - EP 0885372 B1

EP 0885372 B1 2000-11-08 - PROCESS FOR SINKING AND SEALING A BLAST HOLE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR SINKING AND SEALING A BLAST HOLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM TEUFEN UND ABDICHTEN EINER SPRENGBOHRUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CREUSAGE ET D'ETANCHEMENT D'UN TR0U DE MINES

Publication

EP 0885372 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94908201 A

Priority

  • DE 9300743 W
  • DE 4227724 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4227724A1] A process is disclosed for sinking and sealing a blast hole for the seismic reconnaissance of geologic formations. The blast hole is sunk by a direct flush drilling process and is filled with a sealing material. As drilling fluid a slowly hardening hydraulic suspension made of water and a finely granulated mixture of clay minerals and hydraulic binder is used. After the blast hole is finished and the charge of explosives is introduced therein, the blast hole is filled with the suspension set so that it cures within 48 hours within the blast hole into a tight and solid stopper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42D 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42D 1/12 (2006.01); F42D 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42D 1/24 (2013.01); F42D 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0403025 A2 19901219 - SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4227724 A1 19940224; AU 4941893 A 19940315; DE 4393917 D2 19950921; EP 0885372 A1 19981223; EP 0885372 B1 20001108; PL 171842 B1 19970630; PL 312381 A1 19960415; WO 9404885 A1 19940303

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-04-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310120 20001214

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK NL

2000-11-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

1999-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GERMAN WATER AND ENERGY GMBH

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PREUSSAG WASSER UND ROHRTECHNIK GMBH

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990209

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950130

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK NL