Global Patent Index - EP 0885502 A4

EP 0885502 A4 2000-11-08 - AUTHENTICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A REMOTE KEYLESS ENTRY SYSTEM

Title (en)

AUTHENTICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A REMOTE KEYLESS ENTRY SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN FERNBEDIENBARES SCHLÜSSELLOSES EINGANGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'AUTHENTIFICATION DESTINE A UN SYSTEME D'OUVERTURE A DISTANCE SAND CLE

Publication

EP 0885502 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97912769 A

Priority

  • US 9718814 W
  • US 75853096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9826534A1] An authentication system and method changes (407) a symbolic value of a challenge count and encodes (411) it into an authentication symbol using an encoding process. Then, the symbolically-changed challenge count and the authentication symbol are transmitted (415). When received, the symbolically-changed challenge count is encoded (507) using the encoding process, and a receive-side derived authentication symbol is formed therefrom. Authentication is indicated (511) when the authentication symbol and the receive-side derived authentication symbol match.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/00; E05B 49/00; H04L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/00 (2006.01); B60R 25/04 (2006.01); B60R 25/10 (2006.01); E05B 49/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04B 5/02 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 2009/0023 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00253 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); G07C 2209/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9826534 A1 19980618; EP 0885502 A1 19981223; EP 0885502 A4 20001108; JP 2000506947 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030930

2000-11-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04L 9/00 A, 7E 05B 49/00 B, 7H 04L 9/32 B

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981218

1998-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT